skip to content

Hodgson, Todd Robert

CPSO#: 86425

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Dec 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L&G Community Health Team
2235 Parkedale Avenue
Brockville ON  K6V 6B2
Phone: (613) 342-4076
Fax: (613) 342-6578 Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TODD ROBERT HODGSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HODGSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 24 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 20 Aug 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2020