Hodgson, Alexandra Frances (CPSO#: 100888)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: 519-376-2121 Ext. 2535
Fax: 519-370-4068
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A.F. Hodgson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hodgson ( CPSO# 100888)

Business Address:
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Business Address:
1725 10th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 0G5
Phone Number: (519) 370-7239

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA FRANCES HODGSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HODGSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2016