skip to content

Hodgkiss, David Roy

CPSO#: 27337

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 30 Jun 2021
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, ON M6B 3ZE 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 18 May 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 2021