skip to content

Hodge, Jeffrey William Henry

CPSO#: 91334

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

1221 Algonquin Ave
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Canada
Phone: 705-476-6228
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jeffrey Hodge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hodge ( CPSO# 91334 )

Business Address:
1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone Number: (705) 476-6228

Business Address:
217 Turcotte Park Road
Mattawa ON  P0H 1V0
Phone Number: (705) 744-5511

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Mattawa General Hospital Mattawa
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEFFREY WILLIAM HENRY HODGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HODGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014