skip to content

Hodgdon, Taryn

CPSO#: 95918

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Taryn Hodgdon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hodgdon ( CPSO# 95918 )

Business Address:
St. Francis Memorial Hospital
7 St Francis Memorial Dr.
Barry's Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Phone Number: (613) 756-3044

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2500

Business Address:
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-3166

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 744-2420


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TARYN HODGDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HODGDON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2017