Hockmann, Karlo (CPSO#: 98828)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
Department of Medicine
750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste Marie ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: 7057593434
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M2N1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karlo Hockmann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hockmann ( CPSO# 98828 )

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
Department of Medicine
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 06 Nov 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARLO HOCKMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOCKMANN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016