skip to content

Hobdari, Ilda

CPSO#: 87139

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Albanian, English, Italian, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone: (905) 264-9859
Fax: (905) 264-9311 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ilda Hobdari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Hobdari ( CPSO# 87139 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Phone Number: (904) 264-9311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ILDA HOBDARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOBDARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009