skip to content

Ho-Tai, Paul

CPSO#: 33726

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jan 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jan 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Paul Ho-Tai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2019

Medical Records Location

Instructions: To any paitent looking for a copy of their medical records please contact the medical records department at the hospital or healthcare facility where your diagnostic imaging study was performed.
Date Received: 04 Jan 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jan 2019