skip to content

Ho, Ru-Chie

CPSO#: 24528

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 May 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 May 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:National Taiwan University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone: (905) 579-1212 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

11 Gibb St
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Canada
Phone: 905 579 3628
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ru-Chie Ho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ho ( CPSO# 24528 )

Business Address:
11 Gibb Street
Oshawa ON  L1H 2J9
Phone Number: (950) 579-3628


Corporation Name: R. Ho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2012
Corporation Name: C. John Ho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ho ( CPSO# 24528 )
Dr. C. Ho ( CPSO# 75256 )

Business Address:
Athlete's Care
C 120 - 11 King Street
Toronto ON  M5H 4C7
Phone Number: (416) 368-9990

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RU-CHIE HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1972