skip to content

Ho, Melissa Wei-Yee

CPSO#: 93147

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
North York General Hospital
Room 1 SE-157
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6520
Fax: 8557563454 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: 416-461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Don Mills Surgical Unit
Suite 103
20 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Canada
Phone: 416-441-2111
Fax: 416-441-2114
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

162 Cumberland St - Suite 225
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 925-0113
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia
M300
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: 4164804864
Fax: 4164806039
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

330 Highway 7 E
Digestive Health Clinic
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Canada
Phone: 905-707-5007
Fax: 905-707-5008
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Melissa Ho Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ho ( CPSO# 93147 )

Business Address:
225 - 162 Cumberland Street
Toronto ON  M3R 3N5
Phone Number: (416) 925-0113

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
4001 Leslie Street
Room 1SE-157
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6520

Business Address:
221 - 2180 Steeles Avenue West
Concord ON  L4K 2Z5
Phone Number: (416) 292-0330

Business Address:
103-20 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Phone Number: (416) 441-2111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELISSA WEI-YEE HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015