skip to content

Ho, May Tze-May

CPSO#: 30554

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Mar 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:14 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Feb 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Mar 1983