skip to content

Ho, Julia Wing Ying

CPSO#: 22223

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Jul 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:Lingnan University, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:01 Jan 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1957
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000