skip to content

Ho, Helen Hai Yin

CPSO#: 23872

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Nov 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 17 Nov 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 716
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON M5G 1N8
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 597-3343
Fax: 416-813-4179 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:19 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 27 Nov 2020 Active
 As from November 17, 2020, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Helen Hai Yin Ho in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Ho to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. HELEN HAI YIN HO
("Dr. Ho")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")


A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 

"Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;

"IEP" means Individualized Education Plan;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan; 

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public;

"QAC" means the Quality Assurance Committee of the College.

(2)	I, Dr. Ho, certificate of registration number 23872, am a member of the College.  

(3)	I, Dr. Ho, acknowledge that concerns have been identified with respect to my knowledge, skill and judgment. I am aware of the College's concern about protecting the public.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(4)	I, Dr. Ho, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5)	Clinical Supervision

(a)	I, Dr. Ho, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or supervisors acceptable to the College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 

(b)		I, Dr. Ho, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking attached hereto as Appendix "A", and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:

(i)	Facilitate the education program set out in the IEP attached as Appendix "B";

(ii)	Review the materials provided by the College and have an initial meeting to discuss the objectives for the Clinical Supervision and practice improvement recommendations;

(iii)	Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, no less than monthly for the first three (3) months and then once every three (3) months thereafter 

(iv)	Review at least twelve (12) of my patient charts at every meeting;

(v)	Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;

(vi)	Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations;

(vii)	Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and

(viii)	Submit a written report monthly for the first three (3) months, and then every three (3) months for the remainder six (6) reports total.  

(c)	I, Dr. Ho, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the assessor dated July 6, 2020 and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

(d)	I, Dr. Ho, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice described in section (5) of this Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and undertake to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development. 

(e)	I, Dr. Ho, acknowledge that in making its determination that I may return to unsupervised practice, the College may require that I sign a further undertaking imposing terms, conditions and limitations on my certificate of registration or requiring ongoing re-assessments, clinical supervision and/or monitoring. 

(f)	I, Dr. Ho, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking. 

(g)	I, Dr. Ho, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.

(h)	I, Dr. Ho, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor as set out in sections (5)(f) and (5)(g) above, including returning a signed Appendix "A" within thirty (30) days, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  

(i)	I, Dr. Ho, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as a result of section (5)(h) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and said term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.

(6)	Professional Education

(a)	I, Dr. Ho, undertake to participate in and successfully complete the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

(i)	Review, reflection, written summary and discussion with Clinical Supervisor: 

1.	Ontario Cervical Screening Guidelines Summary; 
2.	Ontario Breast Screening Guidelines;
3.	Initial Investigation and Management of Benign Ovarian Masses;
4.	CMPA elearning Documentation Module;
5.	CPSO Medical Records Policy;
6.	Managing Test Results;
7.	Canadian Task Force on Preventative Health Care; and 
8.	Choosing Wisely Canada.

(ii)	all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B"; and

(iii)	any additional professional education recommended by my Clinical Supervisor.

(b)	I, Dr. Ho, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within three (3) months of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. Ho, undertake to review the College Policy, Clinical Practice Guidelines and other Self-study, the documents as outlined in the IEP, attached as Appendix "B".   The review, to be completed within three (3) months, will include a written summary of up to 2000 words, making reference to current standards of practice, how they are applicable to my situation as well as how I have made or plans to make changes to my  practice. The written review will be submitted to the College to ensure its completeness.

(d)	I, Dr. Ho, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(e)	I, Dr. Ho, undertake to complete this requirement within three months or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.

(7)	Reassessment of Practice  

(a)	I, Dr. Ho, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision and the Professional Education set out above and in Appendix "A" and Appendix "B" attached, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice (the "Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.

(b)	I, Dr. Ho, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment conducted under section (7) of this Undertaking. 

(c)	I, Dr. Ho, acknowledge and provide consent that my Clinical Supervisor may receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 

(d)	I, Dr. Ho, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 

(8)	Monitoring

(a)	I, Dr. Ho, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" of "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b)	I, Dr. Ho, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT 

(9)	I, Dr. Ho, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(10)	I, Dr. Ho, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(11)	I, Dr. Ho, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(12)	I, Dr. Ho, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(13)	I, Dr. Ho, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in any one or more of the following: consideration by the QAC, an investigation by the College, or further action by the College, including a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

(14)	I, Dr. Ho, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(15)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Ho, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Ho, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Ho's knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:

	Dr. Ho will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months. 
	Dr. Ho will engage in professional education, including in screening, medical record keeping and preventative health.
	Dr. Ho's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within three (3) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.

D.	CONSENT

(16)	I, Dr. Ho, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(17)	I, Dr. Ho, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "C".

(18)	I, Dr. Ho, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who facilitates my completion of the Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors and Assessors:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 

(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(19)	I, Dr. Ho, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(20)	I, Dr. Ho, give my irrevocable consent to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff, Assessors, and any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

(a)	relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A";

(c)	relevant to the Reassessment;

(d)	relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and  

(e)	which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.



 


Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 17, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Helen Hai Yin Ho to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 17, 2020:

Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Ho’s knowledge, skill and judgment. As a result:
Dr. Ho will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months.

Dr. Ho will engage in professional education, including in screening, medical record keeping and preventative health.

Dr. Ho’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within three (3) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.