skip to content

Ho, Francis Yip-Leung

CPSO#: 30173

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Jul 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education: University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: 
Heart Lake Medical Centre
C/O Cathy - Office Manager
10425 Kennedy Road North
Brampton, Ontario
L6Z 0A4
Date Received: 01 Mar 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 31 Jan 2000
Summary:

On January 31, 2000 the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Ho’s plea of guilty and found him guilty of professional misconduct with regard to failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Committee subsequently ordered the following:

1) Dr. Ho to appear before the Committee to be reprimanded;

2) The Committee directs the Registrar of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario to:

a) Record the fact of Dr. Ho’s reprimand on the register;
b) Suspend Dr. Ho’s certificate of registration for three months, starting on a date to be set by the Registrar after conferring with Dr. Ho but not more than sixty days after the date of this order;

c) Suspend the effect of the order in paragraph (c) above on the condition that, within thirty days after the date of this order Dr. Ho agrees to, and subsequently completes, the following:

i) Dr. Ho will participate in and complete the Physician Review Program (PREP) by October 31, 2000 at his own expense;
 
ii) Dr. Ho will abide by the outcome of his participation in the PREP, including any restrictions which arise out of the category he obtains in the PREP, which he acknowledges to include:

(1) If Dr. Ho obtains a category 1 outcome, he need do nothing other than regular CME activities and the suspension in paragraph (c) of this order will be stayed in perpetuity;

(2) If Dr. Ho obtains a category 2 or 3 outcome, he will undertake promptly any educational activities and arrange promptly any educational supervision prescribed or recommended by the PREP and participate in any reassessment (in the case of a category 3 outcome) prescribed or recommended by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario;

(3) If Dr. Ho obtains a category 4 outcome, he will cease practising medicine except under direct supervision and for the purpose of participating in structured educational activities, such practice restrictions to continue until Dr. Ho is reassessed by the PREP and obtains a category 1, 2 or 3 outcome;

(4) If Dr. Ho obtains a category 5 outcome, he will cease practicing medicine except in an educational setting approved by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario and under close supervision, such practice restrictions to continue until Dr. Ho is reassessed by the PREP and obtains a category 1, 2 or 3 outcome;

(5) If Dr. Ho obtains a category 6 outcome, he will cease practicing medicine and submit to any further assessment prescribed or recommended by the PREP.

d) Suspend Dr. Ho’s certificate of registration for a period of three months, to commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar in the event that Dr. Ho fails to comply with paragraphs (c) (i) and (c) (ii) (1) through (5).
 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 31, 2000