skip to content

Ho, Angela Onkay

CPSO#: 90794

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MATCH (Multidisciplinary Access To
Care and Housing program)
c/o Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St. E. 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 1K5
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

TS Medical Centre - Couples Therapy
692 Euclid Ave
Toronto ON  M6G 2T9
Canada
Phone: 1-833-933-8993
Fax: (416) 933-8995
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANGELA ONKAY HO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014