skip to content

Hirsz, Abraham Isaac

CPSO#: 31461

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 May 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 May 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yiddish

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 522
Box 58/59
790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 591-1222
Fax: (416) 591-1227 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hirsz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 30 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ABRAHAM ISAAC HIRSZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIRSZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1980