skip to content

Hirsh, Michael Stanley

CPSO#: 33415

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Mar 1992
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Mar 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 507
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 728-4605
Fax: (613) 380-8189 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Hirsh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hirsh ( CPSO# 33415 )

Business Address:
Suite 507
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone Number: (613) 728-4605

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL STANLEY HIRSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIRSH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 1992