skip to content

Hirsch, Peter Joseph

CPSO#: 21896

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Mar 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Mar 2012

Summary

Date of Death: 30-Oct-2012

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of St. Andrews, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Mar 2012