skip to content

Hirji, Zameer

CPSO#: 88571

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 11010 - 101 Street Northwest Edmonton, AB T5H 4B9
Date Received: 16 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2014