Hindieh, Waseem Hekmat (CPSO#: 96583)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON  L7S 1A7
Phone: (905) 681-4818
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Units 11-14
398 Steele Ave W
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X3
Canada
Phone: (905) 881-0334
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

633 York Regional Rd 7
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7127
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Waseem Hindieh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hindieh ( CPSO# 96583 )

Business Address:
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 1A7
Phone Number: (905) 681-4818

Business Address:
Suites 11-14
398 Steele Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X3
Phone Number: (905) 881-0334

Business Address:
6633 York Regional Road 7
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 472-7127

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WASEEM HEKMAT HINDIEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HINDIEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 28 Aug 2011
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2016