skip to content

Hillyard, David George

CPSO#: 27059

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Oct 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Family Practice medical records are located at: Cottage Country Family Health Team 5 Pineridge Gate Gravenhurst ON P1P 1Z3 Muskoka Shores LTC medical records are located at: 200 Kelly Drive Gravenhurst ON P1P 1P3
Date Received: 01 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018