skip to content

Hill, Arnold James

CPSO#: 94804

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Arnold James Hill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 5 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Weeneebayko General Hospital Moose Factory, ON P01 1W0
Date Received: 27 Apr 2018


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018