skip to content

Hildebrand, Kyla Jade

CPSO#: 85424

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kyla J. Hildebrand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 30 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:02 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2006 to 27 Aug 2006
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2007 to 18 Nov 2007
EL - Paediatric Respirology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 10 Mar 2008 to 06 Apr 2008
EL - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2013