skip to content

Hildebrand, Ainslie Marie

CPSO#: 90319

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: University of Edmonton Alberta, 11-112R Clinical Sciences Building, 152 University Campus, Edmonton, AB, T6G 2G3
Date Received: 16 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2016