skip to content

Hijazi, Ramsey Alexander

CPSO#: 97866

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West End Family Care Clinic
80 Michael Cowpland Drive
Ottawa ON  K2M 1P6
Phone: (613) 599-3321 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

150 Katimivik rd
Ottawa ON  K2L 2N2
Canada
Phone: 613-482-0118
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAMSEY ALEXANDER HIJAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIJAZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014