skip to content

Hierlihy, Phyllis Jane

CPSO#: 23106

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Sep 1970
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1919 Riverside Drive
Suite 404
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone: (613) 860-3632
Fax: (613) 569-0889 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital, Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Dr. Ottawa, Ont.
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 738-8400
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd.
Ottawa, Ont.
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: P.J. Hierlihy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hierlihy ( CPSO# 23106 )

Business Address:
The Riverside Professional Centre
404 - 1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 860-3632


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PHYLLIS JANE HIERLIHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIERLIHY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1970