skip to content

Hickey, Edward John Brendan

CPSO#: 89354

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jan 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Southampton, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Cardiovascular Surgery
Room 1518 B
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6420 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

UHN Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-4800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Edward Hickey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 31 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EDWARD JOHN BRENDAN HICKEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HICKEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2017