skip to content

Heymans, Gerry Adrianes

CPSO#: 31373

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Feb 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Mar 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Russell Meadows
475 Church Street
Russell ON  K4R 0A9
Phone: (613) 445-5200
Fax: (613) 445-5100 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kemptville Retirement Living
2950 Highway 43
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Canada
Phone: (613) 258-7800
Fax: (613) 215-0879
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Gerry Heymans Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Heymans ( CPSO# 31373 )

Business Address:
The Russell Meadows
475 Church Street
Russell ON  K4R 0A9
Phone Number: (613) 445-5200

Business Address:
Kemptville Retirement Living
2950 Highway 43
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-7800

Medical Records Location

Address: Please fax all information or information requests to the corresponding clinic needed: Dundas Manor Fax: 613-774-5507 Kemptvill Retirement Living Fax: 613-215-0879 The Russel Meadows Fax: 613-445-5100
Date Received: 19 Aug 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 08 Mar 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 04 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 16 Oct 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 12 Oct 2018
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 17 Nov 2018
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 17 Feb 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 11 Nov 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 11 Nov 2019 Active
             (1 of 2) As from 11:59 p.m., October 12, 2018, by order of the Discipline
            Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following
            terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Gerry Adrianes Heymans:

                  (i)   Dr. Heymans shall only practice medicine in facilities designated
                        as Retirement Homes and/or Long-term Care Homes, as defined in the
                        Retirement Homes Act, 2010, S.O. 2010 c.11 and the Long-Term Care
                        Homes Act, 2007, S.O. 2007, c.8, and associated Regulations, unless
                        otherwise approved of in writing by the College; 
                  
                  (ii)  Dr. Heymans shall engage in direct patient care no more than thirty
                        (30) hours per week, and this restriction supersedes Dr. Heymans'
                        undertaking signed on March 8, 2013, in so far as the maximum
                        number of hours he is permitted to work per week; 
                  
                  (iii) Dr. Heymans shall not engage in any professional encounters, in
                        person or otherwise ("Professional Encounter(s)"), with patients of
                        any age, unless in the continuous presence and under the direct
                        observation of a monitor (the "Monitor") who is a regulated health
                        professional and employed at the facility where Dr. Heymans
                        provides care; 
                  
                  (iv)  Dr. Heymans shall maintain a log ("the Log") of all Professional
                        Encounters with patients. Dr. Heymans shall ensure that the Monitor
                        initials each entry on the Log for each patient seen in the
                        Professional Encounter  and shall make this Log available to the
                        College upon request;
                  
                  (v)   Dr. Heymans shall annually submit to the College, a report prepared
                        by his sleep disorder specialist or his family physician, regarding
                        Dr. Heymans sleep disorder, commencing within one year of the date
                        of this Order;  
                  
                  (vi)  Dr. Heymans shall inform the College of each and every location
                        where he practices, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice
                        Location(s)") within fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at
                        that location; 
                  
                  (vii) Dr. Heymans shall be responsible for any and all fees, costs, and
                        expenses, associated with implementing and fulfilling the terms of
                        this Order; and
                  
                  (viii)Dr. Heymans shall provide irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor compliance with this Order. 
                  
            (2 of 2) As from March 8, 2013, the following is imposed as a term, condition
            and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Gerry Adrianes
            Heymans, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Heymans to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Heymans shall engage in direct patient care no more than forty-five
                  (45) hours per week.  Dr. Heymans shall not work any overnight shifts.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Oct 2018
Summary:

On October 12, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Gerry Adrianes Heymans committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant 
to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  
 
Disposition 
 
On October 12, 2018, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
-    the Registrar suspend Dr. Heymans’ Certificate of Registration for a three (3) month period 
     effective 12:01 a.m. on November 17, 2018.  
-    the  Registrar  impose  the  following  terms,  conditions  and  limitations  on  Dr.  Heymans’ 
     Certificate of Registration: 
     -  Dr. Heymans shall only practice medicine in facilities designated as Retirement Homes 
        and/or Long-term Care Homes, as defined in the Retirement Homes Act, 2010, S.O. 2010 
        c.11  and  the Long-Term  Care  Homes  Act,  2007,  S.O.  2007,  c.8,  and  associated 
        Regulations, unless otherwise approved of in writing by the College;  
     -  Dr. Heymans shall engage in direct patient care no more than thirty (30) hours per week, 
        and this restriction supersedes Dr. Heymans’ undertaking signed on March 8, 2013, in so 
        far as the maximum number of hours he is permitted to work per week;  
     -  Dr.  Heymans  shall  not  engage  in  any  professional  encounters,  in  person  or  otherwise 
        (“Professional Encounter(s)”), with patients of any age, unless in the continuous presence 
        and under the direct observation of a monitor (the “Monitor”) who is a regulated health 
        professional and employed at the facility where Dr. Heymans provides care;  
     -  Dr.  Heymans  shall  maintain  a  log  (“the  Log”)  of  all  Professional  Encounters  with 
        patients. Dr. Heymans shall ensure that the Monitor initials each entry on the Log for each 
        patient  seen  in  the  Professional  Encounter    and  shall  make  this  Log  available  to  the 
        College upon request; 
     -  Dr. Heymans shall annually submit to the College, a report prepared by his sleep disorder 
        specialist  or  his  family  physician,  regarding  Dr.  Heymans  sleep  disorder,  commencing 
        within one year of the date of this Order;   
     -  Dr. Heymans shall inform the College of each and every location where he practices, in 
        any  jurisdiction  (collectively  my  “Practice  Location(s)”)  within  fifteen  (15)  days  of 
        commencing practice at that location;  
     -  Dr. Heymans shall be responsible for any and all fees, costs, and expenses, associated 
        with implementing and fulfilling the terms of this Order; and 
     -  Dr.  Heymans  shall  provide  irrevocable  consent  to  the  College  to  make  appropriate 
        enquiries of OHIP and/or any person or institution that may have relevant information, in 
        order for the College to monitor compliance with this Order.  
-    Dr. Heymans appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-    Dr. Heymans pay costs to the College in the amount of  $6,000.00 within thirty (30) days of 
     the date of this Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): October 12, 2018 1:00 p.m. start