skip to content

Hewitson, Albert Gordon

CPSO#: 13668

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 1986
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1958 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1951
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Apr 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1986