skip to content

Hetherington, Kerri Lynn

CPSO#: 85088

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2023

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201-520 University Ave W
Waterloo ON  N2T 2Z6
Phone: 519-744-7200 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kerri Hetherington Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2023

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hetherington ( CPSO# 85088 )

Business Address:
17 Post Horn Pl
Waterloo ON  N2L 5E8

Business Address:
201-520 University Ave W
Waterloo ON  N2T 2Z6

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KERRI LYNN HETHERINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HETHERINGTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2023