skip to content

Hess, Tiiu Mai

CPSO#: 88558

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian, French

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 400
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone: (416) 748-2020 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

377 Church St.
Suite 302
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7360
Fax: (905) 472-7148
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Suite 513
2425 Bloor St. West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Canada
Phone: (416) 760-8763
Fax: (416) 689-2276
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ararat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ararat ( CPSO# 84236 )
Dr. T. Hess ( CPSO# 88558 )

Business Address:
C2 - 2 Champagne Drive
North York ON  M3J 0K2
Phone Number: (416) 792-3043

Business Address:
St Josephs Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
400 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 748-2020

Business Address:
302 - 377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7360

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TIIU MAI HESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HESS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2013