skip to content

Hess, Frederick William

CPSO#: 12039

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 1998

Summary

Date of Death: 17-Sep-2012

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1946

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1952 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1946
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1998
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.