skip to content

Hess, Allan Rae

CPSO#: 31772

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
637 Davis Drive
Suite 100
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2R2
Phone: (905) 898-7924
Fax: (905) 853-8677 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Allan R. Hess Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hess ( CPSO# 31772 )

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9

Business Address:
100 - 637 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2R2
Phone Number: (905) 898-7924

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALLAN RAE HESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HESS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1980