skip to content

Heslop, Claire L

CPSO#: 96075

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3856 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Claire L. Heslop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Heslop ( CPSO# 96075 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 490
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Business Address:
Sickkids ER - 170 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E8
Phone Number: (416) 813-5807

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CLAIRE L HESLOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HESLOP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2019