skip to content

Hertzog, Valerie Melissa

CPSO#: 95749

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
610-1525 Carling Ave
Aroga Lifestyle Medicine Ottawa
Ottawa ON  K1Z 8R9
Phone: 1-888-802-7642
Fax: 6137039757 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

210-1545 Carling Ave
Telus Health Care Centre - Ottawa
Ottawa ON  K1Z 8P9
Canada
Phone: 613-521-8313
Fax: 613-521-8649
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VALERIE MELISSA HERTZOG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERTZOG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2013