skip to content

Hersi, Jamila Hassan

CPSO#: 97856

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Somalian

Education:Medical University of the Americas (Beli, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
906 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2J8
Phone: (905) 631-8898
Fax: (905) 631-8895 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jamila Hersi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hersi ( CPSO# 97856 )

Business Address:
906 Brant Street
Upper Level
Burlington ON  L7R 2J5
Phone Number: (905) 631-8898

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMILA HASSAN HERSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERSI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014