skip to content

Herschorn, Andrea Beth

CPSO#: 90792

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
845 St Clair Ave W
Suite 305
Toronto ON  M6C 1C3
Phone: 416-410-1818 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bliss Laser
3091 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2A4
Canada
Phone: (416) 787-4138
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Herschorn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Herschorn ( CPSO# 26229 )
Dr. A. Herschorn ( CPSO# 90792 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite MG-408
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4787


Corporation Name: Andrea Herschorn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Herschorn ( CPSO# 90792 )

Business Address:
845 St. Clair Avenue West
Suite 305
Toronto ON  M6C 1C3
Phone Number: 416-410-1818

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREA BETH HERSCHORN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERSCHORN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011