skip to content

Herman, Leon

CPSO#: 25726

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 29 Oct 2020
EXPIRY DATE
29 Oct 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University Of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 51 Waterloo Avenue Toronto ON M3H 3Y1
Date Received: 15 Feb 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2018
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 29 Oct 2020

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 28 Oct 2020
Summary:

On June 26, 2019, allegations of Dr. Herman’s professional misconduct were referred to 
the Discipline Committee of the College. It was alleged that in or about 1997, Dr. 
Herman engaged in sexual abuse of and/or disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional conduct towards a patient, who was a teenager at the time.  
 
The matter was heard on October 28, 2020, by way of videoconference, in the presence 
of counsel for the College and counsel for Dr. Herman. On the basis of a Statement of 
Uncontested Facts and Plea of No Contest, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. 
Leon Herman committed an act of professional misconduct in that he sexually abused a 
patient; and engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practise of medicine that, 
having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
Disposition 
On October 29, 2020, the Discipline Committee issued its Order directing that: 
-  the Registrar revoke Dr. Herman’s certificate of registration effective immediately; 
-  Dr. Herman appear before the panel to be reprimanded; 
-  Dr. Herman reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program 
   required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or 
   other security acceptable to the College, within thirty (30) days of this order in the 
   amount of $16,060.00; and  
-  Dr. Herman pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000 within 30 days of the 
   date of this Order. 

The Committee’s full reasons for decision, including the Statement of Uncontested 
Facts and Plea of No Contest, will be released within 12 weeks of the hearing date.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing Date: October 28, 2020