skip to content

Heringer, Thomas

CPSO#: 15550

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Date of Death: 16-Jul-2002

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1995
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.