skip to content

Hergott, Paul Alexander

CPSO#: 31253

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jun 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
177 simpson st
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3V5
Phone: (705) 942-6870
Fax: (705) 942-6880 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: P. Hergott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hergott ( CPSO# 31253 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C5
Phone Number: (705) 942-6845

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 27 May 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAUL ALEXANDER HERGOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERGOTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2010