skip to content

Hercz, Gavril

CPSO#: 30982

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Apr 1986
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Apr 1986

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:McGill University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Complete Kidney Care Centre
Department of Nephrology
Humber River Hospital
200 Church Street
Toronto ON  M9N 1N8
Phone: (416) 658-2241
Fax: (416) 658-2242 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: 4162421000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gavril Hercz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Hercz ( CPSO# 30982 )

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
103 - 2221 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Phone Number: (416) 418-2512


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nephrology Effective: 09 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GAVRIL HERCZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERCZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1986