skip to content

Herath, Jayantha Chandrasiri

CPSO#: 94614

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Apr 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 18 Apr 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English, Sinhala

Education:Med Univ of Varna Dr. Paraskev Stoyanov, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Provincial Forensic Pathology Unit
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone: (647) 329-1926
Fax: (416) 314-4060 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

453 Martin Grove Road
Toronto ON  M9B 4M3
Canada
Phone: (416) 248-8531
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Sri Lanka

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Pathology Effective:24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2012 Active
             Dr. Jayantha Chandrasiri Herath may practise medicine independently in
            Anatomical Pathology, only.