skip to content

Herath, Chaturika Harshini Pavithra

CPSO#: 85809

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Oct 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:University of Peradeniya, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2158 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Chaturika Herath Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Herath ( CPSO# 85809 )

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHATURIKA HARSHINI PAVITHRA HERATH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERATH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 25 Mar 2007
PEAP - CF - General Pathology

University Of Toronto, 26 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - General Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
CF - General Pathology

University Of Toronto, 21 Oct 2013 to 17 Nov 2013
EL - General Pathology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2019