skip to content

Hepting, Kristin Leigh

CPSO#: 93268

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Minnow Lake Medical
2015 Bancroft Drive
Sudbury ON  P3B 1T1
Phone: (705) 222-6337 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sudbury Regional Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Ext. 7147
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

1280 Lasalle Blvd
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y8
Canada
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

80 Elm St
Sudbury ON  P3C 1T2
Canada
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kristin L. Hepting Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hepting ( CPSO# 93268 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
Laurentian Site
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
2105 Bancroft Drive
Sudbury ON  P3B 1T1
Phone Number: (705) 222-6337

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KRISTIN LEIGH HEPTING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEPTING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012