skip to content

Henry, David George

CPSO#: 22752

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jun 1970
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Douglas Memorial Hospital
Medical Centre
238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z3
Phone: (905) 871-6622
Fax: (905) 871-1221 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Teal and Dr. Henry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 14 2006
Corporation Name: Dr. Teal and Dr. Henry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Henry ( CPSO# 22752 )
Dr. P. Teal ( CPSO# 23175 )

Business Address:
Douglas Memorial Hospital
Medical Centre
238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z3
Phone Number: (905) 871-6737


Corporation Name: Dalgleish Jayawardene & Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID GEORGE HENRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENRY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 08 Feb 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2022

Concerns

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: March 9, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

               

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)