skip to content

Henry, David Anthony

CPSO#: 28547

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Aug 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Canada 111 St Regis Crescent South Toronto M3J 1Y6 1 888 563 3732 extension 230 Ms. Pauline Stewart, Manager, Physician Services
Instructions: Dr. Henry is retiring from office practice on June 30, 2016. Patients may contact RSRS at above address for records.
Date Received: 28 Apr 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2016
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: September 30, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Anthony Henry to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 30, 2016:

Dr. Henry has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine due to retirement and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.