skip to content

Henneberry-Fudge, John David

CPSO#: 95972

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-522-1155 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

7600 Weston Rd
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8B7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

2-51 James Snow Pky N
Milton ON  L9E 0H1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John David Henneberry-Fudge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Henneberry-Fudge ( CPSO# 95972 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Department of Psychiatry
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4L8
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Business Address:
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN DAVID HENNEBERRY-FUDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENNEBERRY-FUDGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016