skip to content

Hendry, James Michael

CPSO#: 93070

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jul 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Hotel Dieu Hospital Site, Rm B3-041
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: 613-544-3400 Ext. 2117
Fax: 613-545-0576 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Michael Hendry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hendry ( CPSO# 93070 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Suite B3-041
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES MICHAEL HENDRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2017