skip to content

Hendrie, Douglas Strathearn

CPSO#: 33203

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Phone: (519) 752-6829 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Douglas S. Hendrie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hendrie ( CPSO# 33203 )

Business Address:
201-60 Hatt Street
Dundas ON  L9H 7T6
Phone Number: (905) 627-4625

Business Address:
353 St. Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N3
Phone Number: (519) 759-6089

Business Address:
40 Shellington Place
Suite 102
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Phone Number: (519) 752-6829

Medical Records Location

Address: 40 Shellington Place Brantford ON N3S 7Y1
Date Received: 09 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 25 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019