skip to content

Hendrick, Arthur Corbin

CPSO#: 30840

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Apr 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Corbin Hendrick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Hendrick ( CPSO# 30840 )

Business Address:
Alliston Family Physicians
40 - 180 Parsons Road
Alliston ON  L9R 1E8
Phone Number: (705) 435-5633

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3Y 1Y6 Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 16 Feb 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Apr 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: April 25, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Arthur Corbin Hendrick to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 25, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Hendrick engaged in professional misconduct or was incompetent in his family practice, in particular with regards to his opioid prescribing. During the investigation, Dr. Hendrick resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)